MN HF1329 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cancer reporting provisions changed.
Title
Cancer reporting provisions changed.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Second reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2023-03-08 | House | Author added Bahner |
2023-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
2023-02-06 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2341 (Similar To) 2023-03-20 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety