MN HF1327 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Open season for taking wolves prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open season for taking wolves prohibited.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Edelson
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF927 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback