MN HF1326 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Mekeland
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Author added Mekeland
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Shooting range closure prohibited during a state of emergency.
Title
Shooting range closure prohibited during a state of emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Mekeland |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Igo |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Poston, Albright and Gruenhagen |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Bennett, Franson, Daniels, Nash |
2021-02-22 | House | Authors added Lucero, Raleigh, O'Neill |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1202 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy