MN HF1326 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-13 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public entity purchasing requirements modified, solid waste provisions modified, subsurface sewage treatment systems provisions modified, compensable losses due to harmful substances modified, grant eligibility modified, and rulemaking required.
Title
Public entity purchasing requirements modified, solid waste provisions modified, subsurface sewage treatment systems provisions modified, compensable losses due to harmful substances modified, grant eligibility modified, and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-13 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2015-05-13 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-05-12 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF1432 |
2015-03-18 | House | Second reading |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2015-03-09 | House | Author added Backer. |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1432 (Similar To) 2015-05-13 - Second reading