MN HF1322 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Author added Erhardt.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Herbicide purchase exemption created.
Title
Herbicide purchase exemption created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 79 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Author added Erhardt. |
2016-03-17 | House | Author added Nornes. |
2016-03-16 | House | Author added Anderson, S. |
2015-03-23 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Taxes |
2015-03-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1083 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Taxes