MN HF1317 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-17 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Solar energy systems purchase and installation temporary credit provided.
Title
Solar energy systems purchase and installation temporary credit provided.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] |
Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] | Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Jordan |
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lee |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Boe |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2017 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Author added Dziedzic