MN HF1313 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local optional revenue clarified, and obsolete language removed.
Title
Local optional revenue clarified, and obsolete language removed.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Davnie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1416 (Similar To) 2021-03-18 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance