MN HF1312 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Abortions prohibited at or after 20 weeks postfertilization unless certain exceptions apply, civil and criminal penalties provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abortions prohibited at or after 20 weeks postfertilization unless certain exceptions apply, civil and criminal penalties provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Mekeland
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Schomacker
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Demuth
2019-02-25HouseAuthor added Runbeck
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Daniels, Urdahl, Lucero, and Robbins
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1609 (Similar To) 2019-04-01 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback