MN HF131 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Torkelson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-08 - Author added Torkelson
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; law on use of force in defense of home and person clarified, Minnesota's self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, common law duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded for purposes of self-defense, presumption created in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.
Title
Firearms; law on use of force in defense of home and person clarified, Minnesota's self-defense and defense of home laws codified and extended, common law duty to retreat in cases of self-defense outside the home eliminated, boundaries of dwelling expanded for purposes of self-defense, presumption created in the case of a person entering a dwelling or occupied vehicle by stealth or force, and rights available to a person in that person's dwelling extended to a person defending against entry of that person's occupied vehicle.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Author added Torkelson |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Anderson |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Bahr |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added McDonald |
2022-01-31 | House | Authors added Rasmusson and Heinrich |
2021-03-08 | House | Authors added Olson, B.; and Akland |
2021-03-04 | House | Author added Igo |
2021-03-01 | House | Authors added Poston and Albright |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Green, Theis, Lucero, Franson, Raleigh, Daniels, and Nash |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Haley |
2021-02-15 | House | Author added Munson |
2021-02-04 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-02-01 | House | Author added Pfarr |
2021-01-25 | House | Authors added Lueck and Gruenhagen |
2021-01-21 | House | Author added Grossell |
2021-01-19 | House | Authors added Novotny, Erickson, Dettmer, Burkel, Bennett, and Mekeland |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF13 (Similar To) 2021-01-14 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy