MN HF131 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-28 - Authors added Lien and Murphy
Pending: House Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicle registration overpayment reimbursement provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle registration overpayment reimbursement provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-28HouseAuthors added Lien and Murphy
2019-01-24HouseAuthor added Vang
2019-01-22HouseAuthor added Poppe
2019-01-17HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF692 (Similar To) 2019-01-31 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback