MN HF1303 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Authors added Metsa and Marquart.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Authors added Metsa and Marquart.
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
New markets tax credit program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
New markets tax credit program established, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Bob Vogel [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Paul Marquart [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Authors added Metsa and Marquart. |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1327 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Referred to Taxes