MN HF1299 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Author added Stephenson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Forest nursery sale provisions modified, forest carbon sequestration goal established, tree planting provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Forest nursery sale provisions modified, forest carbon sequestration goal established, tree planting provided, report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Richardson |
2019-03-20 | House | Authors added Fischer and Brand |
2019-02-21 | House | Authors added Sandell and Huot |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |