MN HF1295 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added West
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Author added West
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Amateur Sports Commission sales tax collections dedicated.
Title
Minnesota Amateur Sports Commission sales tax collections dedicated.
Sponsors
Rep. Leon Lillie [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Nolan West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Author added West |
2019-02-26 | House | Division action, return to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred by Chair to State Government Finance Division |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF817 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Author added Anderson, P.