MN HF1293 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Early Childhood Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Early childhood learning scholarship funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Early childhood learning scholarship funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] | Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] |
Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Greenman |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Early Childhood Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF705 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Author added Housley