MN HF1281 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-15 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Behavioral health home services and medical respite health home services governing provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Behavioral health home services and medical respite health home services governing provisions modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1834 (Similar To) 2019-03-21 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections