MN HF1272 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-23 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Correction orders and conditional licenses provided for home and community based services programs, and settlement agreements provided.
Title
Correction orders and conditional licenses provided for home and community based services programs, and settlement agreements provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF1181 (Similar To) 2015-03-19 - Second reading