MN HF1269 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health service payment and denial of payment clarified, primary care residency expansion grants modified, practicum incentive payments established, American Indian traditional healing grants established, mental health training program developed, and money appropriated.
Title
Mental health service payment and denial of payment clarified, primary care residency expansion grants modified, practicum incentive payments established, American Indian traditional healing grants established, mental health training program developed, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Liz Olson [D] |
Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1481 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy