MN HF1268 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Small business investment credit made permanent, and technical and conforming changes made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small business investment credit made permanent, and technical and conforming changes made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Kresha
2019-02-21HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-02-21HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-02-18HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Taxes

Same As/Similar To

SF788 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback