MN HF1261 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Scott and Hamilton
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Authors added Scott and Hamilton
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Record and data provisions modified for quality of care complaints.
Title
Record and data provisions modified for quality of care complaints.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Mary Franson [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Jack Considine [D] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Authors added Scott and Hamilton |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Baker |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Lucero |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1170 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy