MN HF1261 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Author added Heintzeman.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State agency rulemaking regulated, and rules having substantial economic impact provided process requirements.
Title
State agency rulemaking regulated, and rules having substantial economic impact provided process requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Author added Heintzeman. |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices |
2015-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1329 (Similar To) 2015-03-04 - Referred to State and Local Government