MN HF1257 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Author added Mariani
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drug benefit transparency and disclosure required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Mariani
2019-03-18HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Hornstein
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthors added Brand and Poston
2019-03-11HouseAuthors added Masin and Bahner
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Moller
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-02-27HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF1006 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback