MN HF1256 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Adult foster care and community residential setting license capacity modified, and various provisions governing home and community-based services modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult foster care and community residential setting license capacity modified, and various provisions governing home and community-based services modified.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Olson
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF174 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Second reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback