MN HF1253 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Barriers to employment for people with mental illness report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Barriers to employment for people with mental illness report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Zack Stephenson [D] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Erin Koegel [D] | Rep. Bob Gunther [R] |
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] |
Rep. Jeff Brand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Lien |
2019-03-04 | House | Author added Mann |
2019-02-18 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF970 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy