MN HF1253 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Author added Brand
Pending: House Jobs and Economic Development Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Barriers to employment for people with mental illness report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barriers to employment for people with mental illness report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Brand
2019-03-27HouseAuthor added Lien
2019-03-04HouseAuthor added Mann
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Xiong, J.
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF970 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback