MN HF1253 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-04 - Author added Moran.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Electronic delivery device use prohibited, and sampling of vapor from electronic delivery devices allowed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electronic delivery device use prohibited, and sampling of vapor from electronic delivery devices allowed.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04HouseAuthor added Moran.
2015-03-09HouseAuthor added Newton.
2015-03-02HouseAuthor added Freiberg.
2015-02-26HouseAuthors added Lillie and Persell.
2015-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF1135 (Similar To) 2015-02-26 - Referred to Health, Human Services and Housing

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback