MN HF1247 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Author stricken Becker-Finn
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Anatomical gift that is an eye or an eye part required to be passed on to the Lions Gift of Sight at the University of Minnesota.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anatomical gift that is an eye or an eye part required to be passed on to the Lions Gift of Sight at the University of Minnesota.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseAuthor stricken Becker-Finn
2019-04-03HouseAuthor added Marquart
2019-03-28HouseAuthor added Mekeland
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Becker-Finn
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Eckund
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Persell
2019-02-27HouseAuthors added Huot and Schultz
2019-02-21HouseAuthors added Nornes, Demuth, and Dettmer
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Scott
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF301 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - Authors added Jensen; Klein

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback