MN HF1246 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-7)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-11 - Author added Cantrell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act established, drug manufacturers required to submit drug price information to the commissioner of health, civil penalties provided, and report required.
Title
Prescription Drug Price Transparency Act established, drug manufacturers required to submit drug price information to the commissioner of health, civil penalties provided, and report required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-05-05 | House | Author stricken Gruenhagen |
2020-05-04 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-04-28 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-28 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2020-04-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-04-17 | House | Author stricken McDonald |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, without further rec to amend, re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-27 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means |
2020-02-26 | House | Authors added Her, Noor, and Dehn |
2020-02-20 | House | Author stricken Munson |
2019-05-13 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2019-04-10 | House | Author added Moller |
2019-04-03 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-18 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2019-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2019-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy |
2019-02-27 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Munson and Xiong, J. |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1098 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 78 05/12/2020