MN HF1242 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Secretary of State Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Notice of proposed city ordinances required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of proposed city ordinances required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 90 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed as amended (Y: 41 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Passage (Y: 87 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-23 Secretary of State Chapter 77
2017-05-23 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-23 Secretary of State, Filed
2017-05-23 Governor approval
2017-05-20 Presented to Governor
2017-05-18HouseBill was repassed as amended by the Senate vote: 90-43
2017-05-18HouseThird reading as amended by the Senate
2017-05-18HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-18HouseMotion to concur with Senate amendments
2017-05-18HouseReturned from Senate with amendment
2017-05-18SenateHouse concurred and repassed bill
2017-05-17HouseHouse rule 1.15 (c), message requesting concurrence received
2017-05-16SenateThird reading Passed as amended vote: 41-26
2017-05-16SenateSpecial Order: Rule 45 amendment stricken
2017-05-08SenateSecond reading
2017-05-08SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1224
2017-05-04SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1224, now on General Orders
2017-05-04SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-04SenateReceived from House
2017-05-01HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 87-44
2017-05-01HouseThird reading as amended
2017-05-01HouseAmended
2017-04-27HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 1, 2017.
2017-03-06HouseSecond reading
2017-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2017-02-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1224 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF1242

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF1242&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1242&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1242&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1242&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF1242&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2017&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF1242&session_number=0&year=2017&id=211
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=5301
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF1242&session_number=0&year=2017&id=313

Bill Comments 750

feedback