MN HF1236 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Joint rule 2.03 waived
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Vehicles and other property subject to forfeiture limited, innocent property owners provided recovery, participation in federal equitable sharing program modified, and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles and other property subject to forfeiture limited, innocent property owners provided recovery, participation in federal equitable sharing program modified, and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-07HouseJoint rule 2.03 waived
2020-05-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2020-05-04HouseJoint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration
2020-05-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-28HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-02-25HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1430 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback