MN HF1225 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Author added Elkins
Pending: House Long-Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Payment rate methodology for personal care assistance services established, commissioner of human services required to study methodology, providers required to submit workforce data, and reports required.
Title
Payment rate methodology for personal care assistance services established, commissioner of human services required to study methodology, providers required to submit workforce data, and reports required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Elkins |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred by Chair to Long-Term Care Division |
2019-03-11 | House | Author added Brand |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division |
2019-03-07 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | House | Authors added Bierman and Lee |
2019-02-21 | House | Author added Hamilton |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF968 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy