MN HF1220 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - Author added Boe
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Government prohibited from inducing survey response.
Title
Government prohibited from inducing survey response.
Sponsors
Sen. Cal Bahr [R] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Rep. Jeremy Munson [R] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Lucero |
2021-02-21 | House | Referred by Chair to Local Government Division |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |