MN HF1216 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Duluth; regional exchange district establishment authorized, state general sales tax exemption provided, advisory board created, powers and duties conferred, tax abatement and tax increment financing rules provided, local sales and use tax imposition authorized, state appropriation bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Duluth; regional exchange district establishment authorized, state general sales tax exemption provided, advisory board created, powers and duties conferred, tax abatement and tax increment financing rules provided, local sales and use tax imposition authorized, state appropriation bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseReferred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
2019-03-27HouseDivision action, to adopt as amended and return to Ways and Means
2019-03-04HouseReferred by Chair to Jobs and Economic Development Finance Division
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF1207 (Similar To) 2019-03-13 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback