MN HF1215 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-03 - Author added Hussein
Pending: House Housing Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stable housing mediation grant program established, and money appropriated.
Title
Stable housing mediation grant program established, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Esther Agbaje [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] | Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Kristi Pursell [D] |
Rep. Samakab Hussein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | House | Author added Hussein |
2023-03-09 | House | Author added Pursell |
2023-02-15 | House | Author added Feist |
2023-02-06 | House | Author added Hollins |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Housing Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2233 (Similar To) 2023-03-30 - Author added Duckworth