MN HF1212 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Author added Lillie
Pending: House Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Task Force on Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women created, violence against indigenous women and girls annual report required, and money appropriated.
Title
Task Force on Missing and Murdered Indigenous Women created, violence against indigenous women and girls annual report required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Jerry Hertaus [R] | Rep. Jean Wagenius [D] |
Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Author added Lillie |
2019-02-18 | House | Authors added Gruenhagen and Hornstein |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred by Chair to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SF1736 (Similar To) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy