MN HF1210 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-09 - Author added Freiberg
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Insecticide use prohibited in wildlife management areas.
Title
Insecticide use prohibited in wildlife management areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-02-25 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1312 (Similar To) 2021-04-08 - Author added Rest