MN HF1208 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
Pending: House Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health care quality measures and payment methods required to identify and adjust for health disparities related to race, ethnicity, language, and sociodemographic risk factors; and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health care quality measures and payment methods required to identify and adjust for health disparities related to race, ethnicity, language, and sociodemographic risk factors; and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-16HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices
2015-03-10HouseAuthor added Kahn.
2015-03-09HouseAuthor added Backer.
2015-03-05HouseAuthor added Loeffler.
2015-02-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF501 (Similar To) 2015-03-11 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback