MN HF1206 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spinal Cord and Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Council modified, spinal cord and traumatic brain injury student research scholarship and education program created, and money appropriated.
Title
Spinal Cord and Traumatic Brain Injury Advisory Council modified, spinal cord and traumatic brain injury student research scholarship and education program created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2017-03-06 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Author added Masin. |
2017-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education and Career Readiness Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF735 (Similar To) 2017-02-09 - Referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy