MN HF120 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Authors added Haley and Lillie
Pending: House Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Military veterans job tax credit provided.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Military veterans job tax credit provided.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseAuthors added Haley and Lillie
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes
2019-01-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF300 (Similar To) 2019-02-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback