MN HF1199 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Author added Hassan
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Medical assistance reimbursement rate for critical access mental health services increased.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical assistance reimbursement rate for critical access mental health services increased.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Hassan
2019-03-14HouseAuthor added Pinto
2019-03-04HouseAuthors added Cantrell and Bierman
2019-02-18HouseAuthor added Dehn
2019-02-14HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF1259 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback