MN HF1195 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Psychiatric residential treatment facilities for persons younger than 21 criteria established.
Title
Psychiatric residential treatment facilities for persons younger than 21 criteria established.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Ron Kresha [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion prevailed |
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to re-refer Health and Human Services Finance |
2017-03-02 | House | Second reading |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2017-02-20 | House | Author added Howe. |
2017-02-16 | House | Authors added Clark and Theis. |
2017-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF983 (Similar To) 2017-02-15 - Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy