MN HF1192 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-21 - Author added Lee
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Liquor taxation provisions modified; microdistillery off-sale limit modified; malt liquor packaging and off-sale requirements modified; brand registration requirements modified; bar and restaurant off-sale limitation authorized; and clarifying, conforming, and technical changes made.
Title
Liquor taxation provisions modified; microdistillery off-sale limit modified; malt liquor packaging and off-sale requirements modified; brand registration requirements modified; bar and restaurant off-sale limitation authorized; and clarifying, conforming, and technical changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Liz Olson [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. John Heinrich [R] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Keith Franke [R] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Heather Keeler [D] | Rep. John Poston [R] |
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Sydney Jordan [D] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] |
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] | Rep. Marion O'Neill [R] | Rep. Kristin Robbins [R] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | House | Author added Lee |
2021-04-14 | House | Author added Freiberg |
2021-04-12 | House | Authors added O'Neill and Robbins |
2021-03-25 | House | Author added Anderson |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Acomb |
2021-03-15 | House | Author added Xiong, J. |
2021-03-10 | House | Author added Novotny |
2021-03-09 | House | Author added Jordan |
2021-03-08 | House | Author added Feist |
2021-03-04 | House | Authors added Her, Keeler and Poston |
2021-02-25 | House | Authors added Boe, Hollins and Franke |
2021-02-22 | House | Authors added Heinrich and Boldon |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF1176 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Author added Johnson Stewart