MN HF1189 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-31 - Author added Schultz
Pending: House Climate and Energy Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Utilities Commission regulated process created to allow electric utilities to reduce customer cost when generating plants are retired, account established, and retiring electric generating plant worker transition services provided.
Title
Public Utilities Commission regulated process created to allow electric utilities to reduce customer cost when generating plants are retired, account established, and retiring electric generating plant worker transition services provided.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Author added Schultz |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2322 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy