MN HF1188 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Boldon
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Author added Boldon
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Department of Education licensed school nurse position created, and money appropriated.
Title
Department of Education licensed school nurse position created, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Boldon |
2021-03-17 | House | Author added Hausman |
2021-03-17 | House | Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2280 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Authors added Marty; Wiger