MN HF1188 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Drivers required to slow down when passing stopped service vehicles, and recycling trucks authorized to be equipped with and to use amber lights when collecting recycling.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drivers required to slow down when passing stopped service vehicles, and recycling trucks authorized to be equipped with and to use amber lights when collecting recycling.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateSecond reading
2019-04-11SenateComm report: Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders SF1548
2019-04-10SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF1548, now on General Orders
2019-04-10SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-04-10SenateReceived from House
2019-04-09HouseAuthor added Cantrell
2019-04-08HouseBill was passed
2019-04-08HouseThird reading
2019-04-04HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 08, 2019
2019-03-14HouseSecond reading
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2019-03-11HouseAuthors added Youakim and West
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division

Same As/Similar To

SF1548 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - HF substituted on General Orders HF1188

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback