MN HF1180 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Motion did not prevail vote: 53-74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hands free cell phone use while driving mandated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hands free cell phone use while driving mandated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - House - House: Suspension of Rules (Y: 53 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseMotion did not prevail vote: 53-74
2018-05-16HouseMotion to suspend rules
2018-05-14HouseSecond reading
2018-05-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-03-01HouseAuthors added Grossell, Ecklund, and Dehn, R.
2018-02-22HouseAuthor added Howe.
2017-03-30HouseAuthor added Gruenhagen.
2017-03-09HouseAuthor stricken Gruenhagen.
2017-03-06HouseAuthor added Masin.
2017-03-06HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
2017-03-01HouseAuthor added Pryor.
2017-02-27HouseAuthor added Bennett.
2017-02-15HouseAuthors added Rarick and Flanagan.
2017-02-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF837 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback