MN HF1163 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota ID card requirements modified; changes made related to eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.
Title
Noncompliant driver's license or Minnesota ID card requirements modified; changes made related to eligibility, proof of lawful presence, primary and secondary documentation, and data practices; technical changes made; and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2021-02-22 | House | Author added Bahner |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |