MN HF1152 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Returned by Chair to Government Operations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

County auditors authorized to transmit ballots electronically to persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County auditors authorized to transmit ballots electronically to persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseReturned by Chair to Government Operations
2019-02-21HouseAuthor added Huot
2019-02-15HouseReferred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections
2019-02-14HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SF562 (Similar To) 2019-01-28 - Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback