MN HF1151 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-14 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Child welfare provisions modified, Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act established, criminal penalties provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child welfare provisions modified, Minnesota African American Family Preservation Act established, criminal penalties provided, report required, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-14HouseAuthor added Keeler
2021-03-15HouseAuthors added Hanson, J., and Boldon
2021-03-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy
2021-03-08HouseAuthors added Freiberg and Howard
2021-03-04HouseMotion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Judiciary Finance and Civil Law
2021-03-04HouseAuthor added Bierman
2021-02-25HouseAuthor added Koegel
2021-02-18HouseAuthor added Reyer
2021-02-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Human Services Finance and Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF843 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Author added Murphy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback