MN HF1144 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Author added Wolgamott
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Compensatory spending required to be delivered through evidence-based programs, at least 80 percent of compensatory revenue required to remain at the site where the revenue was earned, compensatory revenue formula modified, and money appropriated.
Title
Compensatory spending required to be delivered through evidence-based programs, at least 80 percent of compensatory revenue required to remain at the site where the revenue was earned, compensatory revenue formula modified, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Sandra Feist [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] |
Rep. Kaela Berg [D] | Rep. Dan Wolgamott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Author added Wolgamott |
2021-04-06 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-02-18 | House | Author added Youakim |
2021-02-15 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF1356 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Author added Weber