MN HF1139 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Author added Neu
Pending: House Subcommittee on Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Author added Neu
Pending: House Subcommittee on Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Annexation prohibited of a designated area by means other than identified in orderly annexation agreement, and annexation of designated area by nonparties prohibited.
Title
Annexation prohibited of a designated area by means other than identified in orderly annexation agreement, and annexation of designated area by nonparties prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Mike Nelson [D] | Sen. Steve Green [R] | Rep. John Persell [D] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Anne Neu Brindley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Neu |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2019-03-27 | House | Author added Ecklund |
2019-02-27 | House | Author added Persell |
2019-02-14 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF1179 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Local Government